Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunting - Lead and Lead-Based Ammunition - Phase-Out
Sponsored by
Senator Lewis Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish a certain process to phase out on or before December 31, 2026, the use of lead or lead-based ammunition for hunting; and requiring the Department to establish a process to certify ammunition as nonlead ammunition.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1473
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hunting - Lead and Lead-Based Ammunition - Phase-Out
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Hunting - Lead and Lead-Based Ammunition - Phase-Out
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:05 PM
Click to return on the top page