Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, M. Washington, Augustine, Watson, Lewis Young, Brooks, and Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the duties of the Secretary of Information Technology related to modernization of information technology systems; altering the authority of the Board of Public Works over certain information technology projects; renaming the Major Information Technology Development Fund; requiring 20% of the amount appropriated to the Fund to be set aside for expedited projects each fiscal year; altering the name, duties, and membership of the Modernize Maryland Oversight Commission; and providing for the terms of certain Commission members.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1188
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {883424/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {153025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Text - First - Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {103429/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Floor Amendment {883424/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {153025/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects
Last Updated: 4/17/2024 9:35 AM
Click to return on the top page