Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to submit, and requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to accept, an application for a property tax exemption for a specific dwelling house that the individual intends to purchase before the individual purchases the dwelling house; requiring the Department, within 15 business days, to process the application and send the applicant a letter regarding preliminary approval or denial of the application; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0809
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943926/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {653321/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {943926/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Floor Amendment {653321/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Veteran, Active Duty, and Surviving Spouse - Application Process
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:10 PM
Click to return on the top page