Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 781
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a 9-8-8 fee to be paid by each subscriber to switched local exchange access service, commercial mobile radio service, or other 9-8-8-accessible service; establishing a prepaid wireless 9-8-8 fee to be paid on certain retail transactions; requiring the Comptroller to deposit the 9-8-8 fees and the prepaid wireless 9-8-8 fees in the 9-8-8 Trust Fund; and requiring the Comptroller to adopt procedures for auditing fee collection and remittance by telephone companies and commercial mobile radio service providers.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0933
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024, July 1, 2027
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273828/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-3)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-26)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2024
Legislative Date
5/16/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 781
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund Fees
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund Fees
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {273828/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund Fees
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (42-3) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (110-26) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2024 5/16/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 781
Text - Chapter - Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services - 9-8-8 Trust Fund Fees
Last Updated: 5/23/2024 2:42 PM
Click to return on the top page