Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Foreclosure Actions - Assignment of Certificates of Sale
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to file a petition with a court to request that a certain certificate of sale be assigned to the governing body of the county or the municipal corporation in a certain foreclosure action under certain circumstances; providing that, on a grant of the petition by the court, the holder of the certificate of sale forfeits certain rights and the amount paid to acquire the certificate of sale; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Sales - Foreclosure Actions - Assignment of Certificates of Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Tax Sales - Foreclosure Actions - Assignment of Certificates of Sale
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:10 PM
Click to return on the top page