Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Office of Permits and Inspections - Denial of Commercial Permit or License for Unpaid Assessed Personal Property Taxes
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Carroll County Office of Permits and Inspections from issuing or renewing a commercial license or permit in the county if the applicant has unpaid assessed personal property taxes except under certain circumstances; and authorizing the Carroll County Office of Permits and Inspections to issue or renew a commercial license or permit if the applicant submits certain evidence that the applicant has paid any previously unpaid assessed personal property taxes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1080
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Carroll County - Office of Permits and Inspections - Denial of Permit or License for Unpaid Personal Property Taxes
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments {943623/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Carroll County - Office of Permits and Inspections - Denial of Commercial Permit or License for Unpaid Assessed Personal Property Taxes
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:05 PM
Click to return on the top page