Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Tariffs, Distributed Energy Resources, and Electric Distribution System Support Services (Distributed Renewable Integration and Vehicle Electrification (DRIVE) Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an investor-owned electric company to file certain time-of-use tariffs with the Public Service Commission by July 1, 2025; requiring an investor-owned electric company to attempt to achieve a reasonable enrollment target for the tariffs by January 1, 2028; authorizing the Commission to require the automatic enrollment of certain customers in a time-of-use tariff on an opt-out basis; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations by May 1, 2025, regarding the interconnection of certain systems; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1256
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463325/1
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Electricity - Tariffs, Distributed Energy Resources, and Electric Distribution System Support Services (Distributed Renewable Integration and Vehicle Electrification (DRIVE) Act)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Favorable with Amendments {463325/1 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {463325/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity - Tariffs, Distributed Energy Resources, and Electric Distribution System Support Services (Distributed Renewable Integration and Vehicle Electrification (DRIVE) Act)
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Economic Matters 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (99-37) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-1001 through 7-1008 )
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 9:46 AM
Click to return on the top page