Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Self-Administered Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a party in a criminal trial involving an allegation of a sexual crime may not introduce evidence that physical evidence of a sexual crime was obtained using certain materials; providing that selling, offering for sale, or distributing a certain self-administered sexual assault evidence collection kit is an unfair, deceptive, or abusive trade practice; establishing the Forensic Nurse Examiner Training Grant Program; and establishing the Forensic Nurse Examiner Training Grant Program Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1047
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {363521/1 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Self-Administered Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 4/06/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {653622/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Floor Amendment {363521/1 (Senator King) Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Self-Administered Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-301,   14-4601 through 14-4604 )
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 2:12 PM
Click to return on the top page