Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsored by
Senators Bailey, Carozza, and Simonaire
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission to plan and conduct observances commemorating the 400th year of Maryland's founding in 2034; requiring the membership of the Commission to reflect the diversity of the State to the extent practical; requiring the Commission to meet at least twice a year; requiring the Commission to provide an update to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2022, and each year thereafter on the plan of action for the commemoration; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1364
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2021
Legislative Date
2/14/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {384338/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {353128/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2021 2/14/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {384338/1 Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {353128/1 Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 688
Text - Chapter - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
(   9-3301 through 9-3307 )
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page