Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Sports Wagering - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the application of the admissions and amusement tax to proceeds from sports wagering.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Sports Wagering - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Sports Wagering - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-8)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Sports Wagering - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Sports Wagering - Prohibition
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Sports Wagering - Prohibition
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Ways and Means 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (128-8) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Returned Passed 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Text - Chapter - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Sports Wagering - Prohibition
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page