Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Planning - Maryland Humanities Council - Appropriation for the Strengthening Humanities Investment in Nonprofits for Equity (SHINE) Grantmaking Initiative
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2024 and 2025, to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $500,000 to the Department of Planning to be used as a grant to the Maryland Humanities Council for the Strengthening Humanities Investment in Nonprofits for Equity (SHINE) grantmaking initiative.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {173026/1 Adopted
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Department of Planning - Maryland Humanities Council - Appropriation for the Strengthening Humanities Investment in Nonprofits for Equity (SHINE) Grantmaking Initiative
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {173026/1 Adopted 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Planning - Maryland Humanities Council - Appropriation for the Strengthening Humanities Investment in Nonprofits for Equity (SHINE) Grantmaking Initiative
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page