Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Reinstatement
Sponsored by
Senators Mautz, Carozza, and Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person whose authorization to catch oysters is revoked under certain provisions of law to apply for reinstatement of the authorization after 5 years; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish an Oyster Harvester Education Program; and requiring an applicant for reinstatement of an oyster authorization to successfully complete the Program.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1223
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0637 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Reinstatement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Reinstatement
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:03 PM
Click to return on the top page