Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Boating - Migratory Waterfowl Season - Prohibited Acts
Sponsored by
Senator Mautz
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from operating a vessel within 500 yards of a stationary blind or blind site that is occupied and being used for hunting migratory waterfowl during open season.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0590
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Boating - Migratory Waterfowl Season - Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Boating - Migratory Waterfowl Season - Prohibited Acts
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:03 PM
Click to return on the top page