Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fish and Wildlife - Endangered and Threatened Species - Definitions, Petitions, and Regulations
Sponsored by
Senator Brooks
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain petitions to review the listing or unlisting of endangered or threatened species to contain certain information regarding the distribution, life, and habitat needs of the species and relevant information about the status of a species; requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to review and, if warranted, update certain regulations listing endangered or threatened species on or before July 1, 2026, and every 5 years thereafter; and defining "fish" and "wildlife" for certain purposes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0345
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663527/1
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/18/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663527/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/18/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-5)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
36AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Fish and Wildlife - Endangered and Threatened Species - Definitions, Petitions, and Regulations
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {663527/1 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2024 2/18/2024 Favorable with Amendments {663527/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2024 2/18/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Fish and Wildlife - Endangered and Threatened Species - Definitions, Petitions, and Regulations
Senate 3/01/2024 2/20/2024 Third Reading Passed (39-5) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Environment and Transportation 36AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Returned Passed 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 11:14 PM
Click to return on the top page