Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Antiretaliation Provisions
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain employers from taking certain actions under the Maryland Wage and Hour Law and the Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law; prohibiting certain employers from discriminating against certain employees under certain circumstances; altering the list of acts that constitute adverse action under a certain provision of law to include a reduction in work hours or other unfavorable schedule changes and the reporting of the suspected citizenship or immigration status of an employee; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Antiretaliation Provisions
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/26/2021 6:56 AM
Click to return on the top page