Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Conversion of Commercial Buildings for Residential Use - Report
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine, Brooks, Feldman, Kagan, and Lewis Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each political subdivision to inventory vacant commercial buildings, develop a plan to convert certain vacant commercial buildings for residential use, and submit a report to the Department of Housing and Community Development on or before January 1, 2025; requiring political subdivision to update the report every 2 years; requiring the Department to establish and maintain a database of vacant commercial buildings in the State that have the potential to be converted for residential use; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {793622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {923525/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Conversion of Commercial Buildings for Residential Use - Report
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Favorable with Amendments {793622/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Floor Amendment {923525/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Conversion of Commercial Buildings for Residential Use - Report
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Environment and Transportation 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/2/2024 4:56 PM
Click to return on the top page