Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Returning Youth Grant Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Returning Youth Grant Program to be administered by the Office of Student Financial Assistance within the Maryland Higher Education Commission; requiring the Office to award a grant of State matching funds to certain students who attend an institution of postsecondary education and receive a federal Pell Grant; and requiring the Division of Parole and Probation and the Department of Juvenile Services to provide information about the Program to individuals who may be eligible for a grant.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Formerly Incarcerated Youth Grant Program - Established
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {713027/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Returning Youth Grant Program - Established
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42 Click to view Recorded Media
(   18-3901 through 18-3904 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page