Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment – Traditional Trade Apprenticeship Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Traditional Trade Apprenticeship Fund in the Maryland Department of Labor as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Secretary of Labor to administer the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; requiring the Director of Apprenticeship and Training to distribute grants of up to $50,000 per participant for a certain purpose; requiring the Director to establish application criteria for programs receiving grants from the Fund; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment – Traditional Trade Apprenticeship Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment – Traditional Trade Apprenticeship Fund
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:29 PM
Click to return on the top page