Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wildlife – Protections and Highway Crossings
Sponsored by
Senator Lewis Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources, in collaboration with the State Highway Administration, to identify and prioritize certain species whose habitat or movement corridors intersect with State highways and develop tools, technology, and techniques to identify certain State highway infrastructure locations; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to develop a methodology and a cost estimate for performing a statewide deer population survey on or before November 1, 2024; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1129
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Wildlife – Protections and Highway Crossings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183826/1
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {643620/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Wildlife – Protections and Highway Crossings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Wildlife – Protections and Highway Crossings
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments {183826/1 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Bailey) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {183826/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Floor Amendment {643620/1 (Senator Bailey) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Wildlife – Protections and Highway Crossings
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Environment and Transportation 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/2/2024 4:56 PM
Click to return on the top page