Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dams With Hydroelectric Power Plants – Annual Compensation Fee
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the owner of a dam associated with a certain hydroelectric power plant to pay an annual compensation fee to the Department of the Environment for the use of State land and waterways beginning January 1, 2023; requiring the Public Service Commission to determine the average price of a Tier 2 renewable energy credit for certain renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Dams With Hydroelectric Power Plants – Annual Compensation Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Dams With Hydroelectric Power Plants – Annual Compensation Fee
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page