Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Safer Communities Fund and Task Force – Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Safer Communities Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund to provide grant assistance to local governments to promote robust and holistic investments in noncarceral safety; and establishing the Safer Communities Task Force to promote noncarceral strategies for safety.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1013
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Text - First - Public Safety – Safer Communities Fund and Task Force – Establishment
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
(   4-1601 through 4-1604 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page