Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Abortion Care Access Act
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Feldman, and Hettleman
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Abortion Care Clinical Training Program in the Maryland Department of Health to ensure that there are a sufficient number of health professionals to provide abortion care; establishing the Abortion Care Clinical Training Program Fund; establishing certain requirements regarding abortion services, including provision and coverage requirements, for certain entities and persons; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $3,500,000 to the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0937
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Abortion Care Access Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543627/1
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543627/1
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Gallion) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (31-16)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {683421/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-31)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {933725/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (17-28)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {513425/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (19-27)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {463720/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {683728/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {503729/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (18-27)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {593122/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-28)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {493629/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (17-27)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {133228/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {503424/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (16-29)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Abortion Care Access Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-14)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Text - First - Abortion Care Access Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543627/1 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543627/1 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Committee Amendment Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Gallion) Rejected (16-30) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (31-16) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Floor Amendment {683421/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-31) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Floor Amendment {933725/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (17-28) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Floor Amendment {513425/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (19-27) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Floor Amendment {463720/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-30) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Floor Amendment {683728/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (16-30) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Floor Amendment {503729/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (18-27) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Floor Amendment {593122/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-28) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Floor Amendment {493629/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (17-27) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Floor Amendment {133228/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-29) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Floor Amendment {503424/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (16-29) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Abortion Care Access Act
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (30-14) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Last Updated: 7/27/2022 4:24 PM
Click to return on the top page