Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception
Sponsored by
Senators Watson and Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a certain exception to the authority of the Child Support Administration to notify the Motor Vehicle Administration of an individual's child support arrearages for the purpose of suspending the individual's driver's license or privilege to drive if the obligor's family income is not greater than 300% of the federal poverty level unless the obligor has been judicially determined to be voluntarily impoverished.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1293
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923222/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {923222/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Referred Judiciary 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page