Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Permanent Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program as a permanent program; and extending the appropriation that the Governor is required to make in the annual budget bill to the Program to fiscal year 2026 and each fiscal year thereafter.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1139
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means Appropriations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {353726/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-14)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Permanent Establishment
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Permanent Establishment
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Referred Ways and Means Appropriations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {353726/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (125-14) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Permanent Establishment
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 4:32 PM
Click to return on the top page