Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Shellfish Aquaculture - Harvest Hours
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Simonaire, Rosapepe, Elfreth, Brooks, and Gile
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a restriction on the harvesting of shellfish between the hours of sunset and sunrise from certain areas leased for aquaculture; and requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish by regulation the hours for harvesting shellfish within leased areas.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0857
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Shellfish Aquaculture - Harvest Hours
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Shellfish Aquaculture - Harvest Hours
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Shellfish Aquaculture - Harvest Hours
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/05/2024 2/22/2024 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2024 2/22/2024 Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Shellfish Aquaculture - Harvest Hours
Senate 3/07/2024 2/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Environment and Transportation 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Returned Passed 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 11:14 PM
Click to return on the top page