Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
Sponsored by
Senator McKay
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, clarifying, and expanding certain provisions of law relating to the immunity from liability of a parent who leaves an unharmed newborn with a responsible adult within 60 days of the birth under certain circumstances; requiring the Secretary of Human Services to develop, implement, and maintain a public information program to inform the public about the Maryland Safe Haven Program; and requiring the Secretary of Human Services to submit a report to the General Assembly about the Maryland Safe Haven Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1323
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/30/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Judiciary 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/30/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 12:41 AM
Click to return on the top page