Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Baltimore City Youth Data Hub for the purpose of promoting well-being of youth and improving access to and cost-efficiency of youth programs; providing that the Youth Data Hub is an integrated, electronic data management system that links data about youth from any provider; establishing an executive committee and providing for a manager to operate the Baltimore City Youth Data Hub; authorizing certain entities to provide data to the Baltimore City Youth Data Hub; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1276
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {593727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {743125/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Ways and Means 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {593727/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (127-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
(   31-101 through 31-110 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page