Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances and Treatment of Chronic Pain and Long-Term Oxygen Use Patients (Continuity of Care Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain requirements related to the provision of information regarding opioid use disorder by the Maryland Department of Health, the prescribing of opioids, and the filling of prescriptions for monitored prescription drugs; establishing certain civil and criminal immunity; requiring a health care provider to make a good-faith effort to maintain the previous dosage of and regimen for a controlled dangerous substance and make certain referrals for a certain patient; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Controlled Dangerous Substances and Treatment of Chronic Pain and Long-Term Oxygen Use Patients (Continuity of Care Act of 2022)
Senate 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   1-1101 through 1-1103, 1-223   )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page