Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development to make financial assistance available to affordable housing developers working in low-income census tracts in order to help close appraisal gaps that occur in historically redlined neighborhoods; requiring the Department to submit an annual report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the funding for census tracts with a majority racial minority population; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1239
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734439/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-21)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - Third - Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {734439/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (114-21) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
(   4-2801 through 4-2806 )
Last Updated: 6/2/2021 5:38 PM
Click to return on the top page