Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Revenge Porn - Civil Action and Reporting Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Gile, James, Lam, Muse, Salling, Waldstreicher, West, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to bring and maintain a civil action for defamation under certain circumstances; and altering the prohibition against revenge porn to prohibit a person from knowingly distributing a computer-generated visual representation that is indistinguishable from another actual and identifiable person under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Revenge Porn - Civil Action and Reporting Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {213223/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Revenge Porn - Civil Action and Reporting Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453621/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Revenge Porn - Civil Action and Reporting Requirement
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {213223/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Revenge Porn - Civil Action and Reporting Requirement
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Referred Judiciary 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 4/06/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {453621/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3-2301 through 3-2305 )
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 8:29 PM
Click to return on the top page