Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits by Financial Institutions
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to receive a deposit for more than one-third of a home improvement contract price before or at the time of the execution of the home improvement contract if the full amount of the deposit is being financed by a financial institution supervised under the Financial Institutions Article.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1135
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits by Financial Institutions
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page