Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Libraries - Circulation Records - Inspection, Use, or Disclosure Requirement Revision
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which public, school, college, or university libraries must permit the inspection, use, or disclosure of the circulation record of an individual.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2023
Legislative Date
2/09/2023
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2023
Legislative Date
2/20/2023
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2023
Legislative Date
3/01/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/15/2023
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2023
Legislative Date
4/10/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2023
Legislative Date
4/02/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2023
Legislative Date
4/04/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-7)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2023
Legislative Date
3/30/2023
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2023
Legislative Date
5/16/2023
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 2/09/2023 2/09/2023 Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Libraries - Circulation Records - Inspection, Use, or Disclosure Requirement Revision
Senate 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/20/2023 2/20/2023 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2023 3/01/2023 Hearing 3/02 at 4:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2023 3/01/2023 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2023 3/06/2023 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2023 3/01/2023 Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Libraries - Circulation Records - Inspection, Use, or Disclosure Requirement Revision
Senate 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2023 3/04/2023 Referred Ways and Means 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2023 3/15/2023 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2023 4/10/2023 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2023 4/02/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2023 4/04/2023 Third Reading Passed (129-7) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2023 3/30/2023 Returned Passed
Post Passage 5/16/2023 5/16/2023 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
Text - Chapter - Libraries - Circulation Records - Inspection, Use, or Disclosure Requirement Revision
Last Updated: 6/9/2023 3:16 PM
Click to return on the top page