Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Damages or Losses - Definition
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "damages" or "losses" in statutory causes of action to protect civil rights or consumer rights and providing that "damages" or "losses" includes reasonable nominal damages.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0832
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - Damages or Losses - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - General Provisions - Damages or Losses - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-30)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - General Provisions - Damages or Losses - Definition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - General Provisions - Damages or Losses - Definition
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Judiciary 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (105-30) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 9:46 AM
Click to return on the top page