Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Performance of X-Ray Duties Without a License
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which individuals without a license to practice medicine may perform X-ray duties; authorizing the State Board of Physicians to impose certain civil penalties for each violation of performing X-ray duties without meeting the requirements of the Act; and requiring the Board, on or before October 1, 2029, to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the number of individuals registered to perform limited X-ray duties and recommendations regarding continuation of the registration process.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0934
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Radiation Therapy, Radiography, Nuclear Medicine Technology, and Radiology Assistance - Limited Licensed Radiologic Technologist
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {783124/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians - Performance of X-Ray Duties Without a License
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments {233027/1 Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Physicians - Performance of X-Ray Duties Without a License
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 4:10 PM
Click to return on the top page