Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jury Examination and Workgroup to Study the Voir Dire Process
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying the purpose of jury examination in any State court is to identify and remove prospective jurors who are unable to serve fairly and impartially and to allow the parties to obtain information that may provide guidance for the use of peremptory challenges and challenges for cause; establishing the Workgroup to Study the Voir Dire Process; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2025.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1079
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024, October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jury Examination
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963324/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jury Examination
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {963324/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jury Examination and Workgroup to Study the Voir Dire Process
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Judiciary 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:00 PM
Click to return on the top page