Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program
Sponsored by
Senators Ellis and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Purple Alert Program to disseminate information to assist in locating a missing person who suffers a cognitive impairment, intellectual or developmental disability, or brain injury who is not eligible for the Silver Alert Program.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0195
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103527/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Missing Persons With Cognitive Impairment - Purple Alert Program
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {103527/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (35-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 8:48 AM
Click to return on the top page