Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal History Records Checks - Youth Camps and Youth Development Organizations and Programs
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the operator of a certain youth camp or youth development organization or program to request a certain determination from the Maryland Department of Health before making a certain offer of employment to a job applicant; requiring the Department to issue a certain determination to a youth camp or youth development organization or program at a certain time; and providing that a certain determination is binding under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (128-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Employment of Previously Convicted Individuals - State Agencies and Youth Camps
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {493126/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal History Records Checks - Youth Camps and Youth Development Organizations and Programs
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (128-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text - Chapter - Criminal History Records Checks - Youth Camps and Youth Development Organizations and Programs
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page