Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund to provide loans to private property owners for hazard mitigation projects, including wind retrofits, flood mitigation elevation, floodproofing, wildland fire retrofit mitigation, and earthquake retrofit mitigation; authorizing the Fund to include money from the Federal Emergency Management Agency; requiring a portion of the Fund to be used for hazard mitigation projects for buildings under certain circumstances; and authorizing loan forgiveness under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1312
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163629/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments {163629/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Resilient Maryland Revolving Loan Fund - Alterations
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page