Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Information Technology and Cybersecurity-Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Griffith, Jackson, King, McCray, Rosapepe, Salling, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (115-15)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a public or private water or sewer system that serves 10,000 or more users and receives financial assistance from the State to assess its vulnerability to a cyber attack; authorizing the Maryland Water Quality Financing Administration to provide financial assistance to a public water or wastewater system to assess system cybersecurity vulnerabilities and develop a cybersecurity plan; establishing the Local Cybersecurity Support Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; altering the duties of the Secretary of Information Technology; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1205
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393321/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613721/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-15)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Government - Information Technology and Cybersecurity-Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022)
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {393321/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Information Technology and Cybersecurity-Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022)
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {613721/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (115-15) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
(   14-104.1 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page