Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility – Feasibility Study
Sponsored by
Senator Brooks
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Stadium Authority to conduct a certain feasibility study for developing, establishing, and operating a sports tourism facility at Reisterstown Regional Park in northwest Baltimore County; requiring the Authority to consult with certain governments, stakeholders and entities in conducting the study; and requiring the Authority to submit a final report of its findings, conclusions, and recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2025.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0741
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility – Feasibility Study
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {913521/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Northwest Baltimore County Sports Tourism Facility – Feasibility Study
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Referred Appropriations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Returned Passed 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 11:42 PM
Click to return on the top page