Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Drinking Driver Monitor Program - Position Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 537
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the establishment of a new Monitor III employee position classification in the Drinking Driver Monitor Program in the Division of Parole and Probation in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; and requiring the salary of the new position to be not less than Grade 13, Step 1 in the Standard Pay Plan established by the Secretary of Budget and Management.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 537
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Text - First - Correctional Services - Drinking Driver Monitor Program - Position Requirement
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Drinking Driver Monitor Program - Position Requirement
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Appropriations 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 537
Text - Chapter - Correctional Services - Drinking Driver Monitor Program - Position Requirement
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page