Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a beer and wine consumption permit and a beer, wine, and liquor consumption permit in Frederick County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to issue the permits to holders of Class A alcoholic beverages licenses to allow for on-premises consumption of beer and wine; requiring an applicant for a permit to submit an application to the Board; authorizing the Board to issue a permit under certain circumstances; providing for the renewal of a permit; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1242
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623194/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Economic Matters 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/31/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {623194/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2021 3/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption Permits
(   20-102, 20-1102.1, 20-1102.2, 20-207 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:19 PM
Click to return on the top page