Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting, from a certain tax on annual gross revenues derived from digital advertising services in the State, advertisement services on digital interfaces owned or operated by or operated on behalf of a broadcast entity and news media entity; prohibiting a person who derives gross revenues from digital advertising in the State from passing on the cost to a certain customer; allowing, for a certain taxable year, a subtraction under the Maryland income tax for certain utility arrearages forgiven during that taxable year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1200
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax – Exemption and Restriction
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {219934/1
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {219934/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {233429/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-31)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
20AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {255361/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-43)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax – Exemption and Restriction
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {219934/1 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {219934/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Floor Amendment {233429/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-31) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax and Tobacco Tax - Alterations and Implementation
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Ways and Means 20AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {255361/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-43) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Text - Chapter - Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation
(   7.5-101, 7.5-102 )
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page