Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Sponsored by
Senators Hester and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition to make recommendations regarding how the State may adjust its economic development and other strategies in the context of changes resulting from crises in certain sectors; and requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim report on or before December 1, 2022, and a final report of its findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2023, to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1424
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0896 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {583621/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {583621/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workgroup on the Post-COVID-19 Crisis Economic Transition
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Referred Economic Matters 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page