Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Officers and Employees - Required Surety Bonds - Insurance Policies Authorized
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - State Treasurer)
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements that certain officers and employees of the State be covered by certain surety bonds to allow the officers and employees to be covered by certain insurance policies; transferring certain duties and responsibilities of the Maryland State Employees Surety Bond Committee to the State Treasurer; and repealing certain provisions of law related to the approval, form, and record of certain surety bonds required for certain officers and employees of the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1012
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Economic Matters
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Officers and Employees - Required Surety Bonds - Insurance Policies Authorized
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Officers and Employees - Required Surety Bonds - Insurance Policies Authorized
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations Economic Matters 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 8:36 AM
Click to return on the top page