Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Sponsored by
Frederick County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1020
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to issue a promoter's permit to a certain for-profit organization under certain circumstances; prohibiting a permit holder from holding an alcoholic beverages license; authorizing a permit holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor at an event; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0743
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {643822/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
39AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2024
Legislative Date
5/16/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1020
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's License
Senate 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {643822/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Economic Matters 39AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Returned Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2024 5/16/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 1020
Text - Chapter - Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Promoter's Permit
Last Updated: 6/11/2024 4:33 PM
Click to return on the top page