Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Business Diversity Incubator Program and Fund - Established
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Business Diversity Incubator Program and Fund in the Department of Commerce to provide grants to certain business entities to establish diverse and effective business incubators in the State; authorizing the Governor in each of fiscal years 2026 through 2031, to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $5,000,000 to the Business Diversity Incubator Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1490
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Economic Development - Business Diversity Incubator Program and Fund - Established
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Business Diversity Incubator Program and Fund - Established
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Referred Ways and Means 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
(   1-101,   5-2501 through 5-2506 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:58 PM
Click to return on the top page