Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Probation - Probation Work Readiness Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Probation Work Readiness Pilot Program to provide dedicated services for individuals placed on probation to obtain and retain employment; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish a pilot program in at least two counties in the State; and requiring the Department to submit a report to the General Assembly by October 1, 2023 and October 1, 2024 that evaluates the Probation Work Readiness Pilot Program.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0636 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Probation - Probation Work Readiness Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Probation - Probation Work Readiness Pilot Program
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-2301 through 3-2302 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page