Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Arts Incubator Workgroup - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes and Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Arts Incubator Workgroup to study how arts and cultural institutions can support local artists; and requiring the Workgroup to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly a preliminary report on its findings, including research, case studies, and examples of approaches used to support artists in other areas, by January 1, 2025, and a final report on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, facilities, or in-kind services that are needed or could be used to support local artists, by October 1, 2025.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1451
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Arts Incubator Workgroup - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator A. Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {463628/1 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Arts Incubator Workgroup - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-9)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Arts Incubator Workgroup - Established
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Favorable 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Hayes) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator A. Washington) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Floor Amendment {463628/1 (Senator Hayes) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Arts Incubator Workgroup - Established
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Referred Appropriations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (128-9) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 9:45 AM
Click to return on the top page