Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Retail Sales of Gift Cards (Gift Card Scams Prevention Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a merchant from selling a certain open- or closed-loop gift card to a consumer unless the merchant meets certain requirements; requiring a certain merchant to provide training to all employees of the merchant on identifying and responding to gift card fraud; requiring the Division of Consumer Protection to create a certain notice and issue certain guidelines regarding gift card fraud; requiring a certain third-party gift card reseller to record and maintain a copy of certain information for at least 3 years; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0896
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2025, October 1, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303520/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {323622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-35)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Retail Sales of Gift Cards (Gift Card Scams Prevention Act of 2024)
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {303520/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Retail Sales of Gift Cards (Gift Card Scams Prevention Act of 2024)
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Economic Matters 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Favorable with Amendments {323622/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (100-35) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Consumer Protection - Retail Sales of Gift Cards (Gift Card Scams Prevention Act of 2024)
(   13-301,   14-4601 through 14-4606 )
Last Updated: 4/17/2024 9:34 AM
Click to return on the top page